THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274100
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £5,773,812 £6,012,907 £6,823,832 £5,927,239 £21,254,686
Total expenditure £6,615,428 £5,909,278 £5,990,562 £6,246,675 £7,035,755