Trustees THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION
Charity number: 274100
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Peter Jonas | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Frederick Thomas Ingham Clark | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Amir Rizwan | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hugo Slim | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DHRUV PRASHANT PATEL | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|||||
OLA OPOOSUN | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neel Purshottam Patani | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Alexandra Ingham Clark | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS RICHARD MALCOLM STODDART-SCOTT | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Charles John Alan Hutchins | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNA PRIESTLEY O'LEARY | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HANIF VIRJI | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM JARVIS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.