Dogfen lywodraethu TWINS TRUST LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/12/2014 as amended on 01 Oct 2019 as amended on 01 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING PERSONS ENGAGED IN MEDICAL, EDUCATIONAL OR WELFARE PROFESSIONS, ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECTS OF MULTIPLE BIRTHS AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES; (B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND PROMOTE THE GENERAL WELFARE OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; (C) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL) OF THE PARENTS OF TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES, WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO THE HEALTH OF WOMEN WHO ARE EXPECTING MULTIPLE BIRTHS OR WHO HAVE GIVEN BIRTH TO TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.