Dogfen lywodraethu ALFANAR
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 2004 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 MAY 2005, 3 OCTOBER 2006 AND 9 MAY 2008. as amended on 09 Jun 2017 as amended on 16 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
a. the advancement of education and learning for the public benefit, and in particular to educate men and women and young people of all ages from a broad range of geographical, ethnic, social and economic backgrounds in the Arab world, to enable them to realise their full potential as individuals, within society as a whole; and b. the relief and prevention of poverty, in particular among socially and economically disadvantaged communities in countries in the Arab world by providing or assisting in the provision of education, training and other support designed to enable members of those communities to generate a sustainable income and be self-sufficient; provided always that nothing contained herein shall authorise or be deemed to authorise the carrying on of any activity for any purposes except those regarded as charitable by the laws of England and Wales.
Maes buddion
OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.