Trustees COOKRIDGE VILLAGE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1015645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ann Smith | Chair | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Whitehouse | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lewis | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Edwards | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Patrick Dale Watkins | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY BEETHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN HAROLD WILLIAM TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.