Trustees Thame Senior Friendship Centre
Charity number: 1039978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynette Alexandra Bretherton | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Butler | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melody Kaplicz | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernice Chapman-Carswell | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Fellowes | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ingram | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Symonds | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Tattersfield | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN MIDWINTER | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Nigel Champken-Woods | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Nichola Dixon | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CHAMPKEN-WOODS | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.