Governing document ST ALBANS DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/12/2015 as amended on 04 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN ST ALBANS DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
ST ALBANS DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.