Trustees EAST LONDON DANCE
Charity number: 1053735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Veronica Rose | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yemisi Turner-Blake | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JANE HACKETT | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Jairaj Amin | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jones | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Fionnuala Hogan | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ambrose | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Woodmansey | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.