Trustees CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CORNWALL
Charity number: 1053899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIGHT REVEREND PHILIP IAN MOUNSTEPHEN | Chair | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Loraine Nancy Mellor | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||
MAJOR STEVE WHITE | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV CARL SMETHURST | Trustee | 23 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev RUTH JOSEPHINE WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev NIKITAS LANTSBERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev BENEDICT RAMSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.