Dogfen lywodraethu Citizens Advice Somerset
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2023 as amended on 21 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL AREA(THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
LOCAL AREA.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.