Trustees THE GERALD COKE HANDEL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1058589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr George Kennaway | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|||||
WALTER RUDELOFF | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA RUTH LEVI | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN FAULKNER | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|||||
PETER MENZIES SMAILL | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rahul Prasad Narain Sinha | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN POTT COTTON | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE BARDWELL | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL BURDEN | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.