Trustees THE FRIENDS OF COVENTRY CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 1061176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN ROYSTON WILLIAMS | Chair | 24 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Michael Mogan MBE | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fraser Watts PhD | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Fielding | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Morris | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Lyndall Williams | Trustee | 27 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jane Wooltorton | Trustee | 27 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAMISH MICHAEL BLAIR | Trustee | 12 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jim Newton | Trustee | 12 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DERYCK HORTON | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV WILLIAM ALFRED HOWARD BA | Trustee | 29 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.