Trustees THE UNITED CHARITIES OF ST MARTIN
Charity number: 200733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter William Hart | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
James Carver | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
COUNCILLOR Jo Hodges | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
LOUIS STEPHEN | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|||||||||
PAM CLAYTON | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynn Denham | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JABBA RIAZ | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
BILL SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MR JIM WHELDON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.