Trustees THE PARISH LANDS AND OTHER CHARITIES
Charity number: 201038
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER GRAHAM BROOM | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ernest George Michael Beard | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Christine Rogers | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Andrew Bruce | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jayne Elizabeth Mills | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Gill | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Gordon Richard Pym | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hodgin | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH SARAH CAROLINE YARDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROMA MARY KATHLEEN MEYERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.