Governing document GREAT HOSPITAL
Charity number: 211953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/01/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE IN THE CITY OF NORWICH OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST HELEN AND OF THE ALMHOUSES KNOWN AS THE GREAT HOSPITAL FOUNDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BENEVOLENT DESIGNS OF KING EDWARD THE SIXTH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CITY OF NORWICH.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.