Trustees ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION
Charity number: 213715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP OF FULHAM | Chair | 19 May 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Edward William Dobson | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Paul Silas Weston | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
The Rt Revd Graham Richard James | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Eileen Clark | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
SUSAN MARGARET JOHNS | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Dr Brian John Taylor Hanson | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.