Linked charities PEMBRIDGE UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 216294
Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 19 MARCH 1915, 12 MARCH 1940, 9 MAY 1952 AND 10 JUNE 1965.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF PEMBRIDGE. GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PEMBRIDGE
Registration history
- 20 February 1963 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.