Trustees WORMINGHALL UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 220553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Susan Tinkler | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Merry | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Amy Lemaire OBE | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Warren Thomas Mark Fowls | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Craggs | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Chadbone | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David McBain | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.