Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE KIDDERMINSTER HOSPITALS
Charity number: 226536
Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Picken QPM | Chair | 12 March 2013 |
|
|||||
David Charles Middleton | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolina Worton | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Titley | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kelly | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Cox | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Mary Steadman | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Joyce | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR RICHARD THOMAS TAYLOR FRCP MP | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE JANE LEE | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN HERBERT | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES SHELLIE | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|||||
SANDRA DRISCOLL | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE BANNISTER | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GERALD WHEELER | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ANN GRAINGER | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.