Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC FINANCE AND ACCOUNTANCY
Charity number: 231060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
38 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Libby Mason | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Toshihiko Ishihara | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aneil Jhumat | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Channell | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lin Liu | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Skinner | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dowse | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Owen | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adesola Adepoju CPFA, FCA | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nina Philippidis | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Nelson | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ileana Steccolini | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Blair | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Milne | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donella Steel | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Dafter | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr D Joyce Christina Dharmaraj | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir Mark Lowcock KCB | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Vaughan | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Crowson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naeem Ahmed | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Williams | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gillett | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Simpson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hardev Virdee | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Newbury | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Donaldson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lee Yale-Helms | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lee Outhwaite | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark McBride | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Ann Culley | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Nadeem Dean | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Al-Beyerty | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Little | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deirdre Bane | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Smith | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rassell | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Samantha Jayne Owen CPFA | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.