Governing document THE COUNTESS OF HUNTINGDON'S CONNEXION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT (CHANCERY DIVISION) DATED 1/1/1899 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 15/5/1990 AND 18/12/1996 AND RESOLUTIONS DATED 19/4/2006 AND 17/6/2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH (AS DEFINED IN THE 1ST SCHEDULE OF THE SCHEME), THE MAINTENANCE OF THE VARIOUS PROPERTIES, AND SUBJECT THERETO, GRANTS TO MINISTERS, THEIR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN, THE TRAINING OF YOUNG MEN AS EVANGELISTS ETC. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 19 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.