Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF HOUSING
Charity number: 244067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraldine Howley | Chair | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Finney | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Carr | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Ria Bailes | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Ballantyne | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Foluke Sangobowale | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Murray | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Harvey | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Evans | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elly Hoult | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Hannigan | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chandrakant Kataria OBE | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.