Governing document THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Charity number: 244976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20/10/1927. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 JUNE 1974, 5 FEBRUARY 2000, 24 MARCH 2001, 16 JUNE 2004 AND 1 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, CARRY ON, ASSIST AND ADVANCE THE WORK AND PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF YORK.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DIOCESE OF YORK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.