Trustees THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF SCIENCE
Charity number: 258854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor James Secord | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Subhadra Das | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jean-Baptiste Gouyon | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Erin Beeston | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice White | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Qidwai | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew Cobb | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Raymond Macauley | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Chartreuse Spary | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Augusta Brazelton | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Amanda Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charlotte Sleigh | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chiara Ambrosio | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.