Trustees THE YOUNG VIC COMPANY
Charity number: 268876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLENN EARLE | Chair | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Layla Madanat | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Parr | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jain Cee Lee | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Farah Ramzan Golant | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kobina Kuttah Holdbrook-Smith | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ebelechukwu Adaeze Okobi | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kwame Yaa Kwei-Armah | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Ali Hossaini | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert James Campbell Easton | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Anna Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Shaw | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Dunn | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVE TOMPKINS | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.