Trustees THE DECORATIVE ARTS SOCIETY 1850 TO PRESENT
Charity number: 271838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Paul Davidson Werner | Chair | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Martin Jeffrey Webster | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Bernbaum | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Ira Wurtzel | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Frances Dunkels | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Claire Barton | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Winterbottom | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CHRISTINE NICHOLS | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robin Lindsay Geoffrey Wyatt | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JOAN BAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.