Governing document THE ROSE ROAD ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH MAY 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 1980, 24 JUNE 1987, 21 MAY 1992 AND 1 OCTOBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES AND PURPOSES ONLY FOR THE CARE, WELL-BEING, TREATMENT, INTERESTS, EDUCATION, ACCOMMODATION, EMPLOYMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES PRIMARILY IN HAMPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.