Trustees THE CHELSEA SOCIETY
Charity number: 276264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Thompson | Chair | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Chris Lenon | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Amalia Carmen Cebreiro | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Lever | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Jane Ingham | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Stephen | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
FLEUR DE VILLIERS | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL ERNEST BACH | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
ALLAN KELLY | Trustee | 23 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MARTYN MURRAY BAKER | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
TERENCE BENDIXSON | Trustee | 15 September 2000 |
|
|
||||||
JANE DORRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.