Trustees BURY ST EDMUNDS WOMEN'S AID CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 276883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Iannelli-Popham | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MAY STAFF | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan O'Neill | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Dearman | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Marie Boyaram | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rachel Stammers | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Leach | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE BURNETT | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINA DYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH LARCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA HARBRON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.