Trustees THE ENGLISH EIGHT CLUB
Charity number: 277108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JAMES WHITBY | Chair | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA KATHRYN DAY | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JAMES JUDGE | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Caleb Abrahams | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|||||
KATE A FITTON | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES LYGOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JAMES HISSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NICK TREMLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM RD MOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX CARGILL THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Julian Claude Peck | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID HENRY WILLIAM DASHWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.