Trustees THE ANCIENT SOCIETY OF COLLEGE YOUTHS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Charity number: 282626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Williams | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Anthony James Bloomfield | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Laura Apter | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Francis Bradford | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Stuart Meyer | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham George Firman | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHRISTOPHER KIPPIN | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|||||
PAUL NICHOL MOUNSEY | Trustee | 23 March 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.