Trustees LICC LIMITED
Charity number: 286102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CHARLES VALLER | Chair | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Helen Sloan | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Christopher Gillies | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ABRAMS | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Olivia Marjorie Harris | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Lloyd Davies | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adeola Victoria Lawrence | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Lacey | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES IBBETT | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.