Trustees FINTON HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 296588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Mehta | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Matthew Falconer | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Turnbull | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saroop Purewal | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Myers | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Walker | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie Trumper | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Tuckey | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie Hart | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Stuart | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Buckley | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Freeman | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Springett Addyman | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clare King | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hobbs BA PGCE | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|||||
MYLES ANDREW PINK | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.