Governing document HEADINGTON SCHOOL OXFORD LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1915 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2014 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
To advance education for the benefit of the public in any way that the trustees see fit, including the provision, maintenance and support of a school or schools, wherein the core values and teaching shall reflect a broad Christian ethos, but also supporting pupils of all faiths and with none.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.