Trustees THE NATIONAL FILM AND TELEVISION SCHOOL
Charity number: 313429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Turner Laing | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Julian Bellamy | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Christina Maria Jenninger | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Scott Forrest | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Lee | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Polly Cochrane | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Silver | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Max Uldahl Pedersen | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Ann Wayland | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver John Madden | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Alexandra Perry | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Strong | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joe Seth Bradbury-Walters | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edward Edgar-Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jon Wardle | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pukar Surendra Mehta | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Daniela Hollick | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK FULLER | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Macdonald | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laurent Samama | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Geoffrey Crossick | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Raja Adil Rehman | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Richard Hyatt MBE | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.