Governing document THE TITUS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 16 SEPTEMBER 1999, 26 JANUARY 2006 AND 1 DECEMBER 2007 as amended on 17 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO SEEK BY EVERY AVAILABLE EFFECTIVE MEANS TO MAKE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH A LIVING PRACTICAL ISSUE TO YOUNG PEOPLE HAVING A PRESENT OR PAST ASSOCIATION WITH INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND WALES, THIS BEING DONE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.