Governing document NATIONAL SPACE CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1999, 19 FEBRUARY 2002, 26 NOVEMBER 2002 & 26 MAY 2006 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO SPACE AND PLANETARY SCIENCE, ASTROMOMY AND TECHNOLOGY AND THEIR SIGNIFICANCE TO LIFE ON EARTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.