Trustees DALTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1076322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Stainton | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY CALLISTER | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Stephen John Nott | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN JOSEPH MCGILL | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
WILHELMINA JOHANNA ROBINSON | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Ian Maddox | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Edward Ward | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Walter Perie | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ANN THURLOW | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
RAYMOND WILLOCK | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN MARGARET JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BARRY JOHN DOUGHTY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.