Governing document CONNECT - THE COMMUNICATION DISABILITY NETWORK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORP 21 DEC 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 18 JUNE 2000, 22 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION 24 SEPT 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 DEC 2009
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH APHASIA AND OTHER COMMUNICATION DISABILITIES AND THEIR CARERS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICES, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND OTHER SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.