Trustees THE PRINCE'S TRUST
Charity number: 1079675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Booth | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Thomas Segun Ilube CBE | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Dingemans | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikesh Kotecha OBE DL | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sian Evans | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Anne Efua Gloria Neubert | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pavita Cooper | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynne Weedall | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Armatrading MBE | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dearnley | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tania Slowe | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Oldfield | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.