Trustees ENRYCH
Charity number: 1088623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Crandley | Chair | 28 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Stuart David Michael Miller | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Louise Gibbons | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|||||
David Malcolm Sellers | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Killip | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Joseph Strong | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Sharon Patmore | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Martin Jeffery | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Raymond Mulvey | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Anthoney | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Jervis Surtees | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.