Trustees CARING TOGETHER CHARITY
Charity number: 1091522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Victoria Hayes | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bertone Santos Socorro | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Christina O'Connell | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hill | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donna Marie Talbot | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Mclellan Evans | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart Hipple | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Griffiths | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Christina Wells | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.