Dogfen lywodraethu FIRE FIGHTERS CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2015 as amended on 08 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are (1) such charitable purposes as the Trustees shall in their absolute discretion determine (including, without limitation, the relief of poverty; the advancement of health or the saving of lives) for those persons having a direct or indirect association with the fire services community (‘the beneficiary class’) as defined in the Charity’s rules and (2) the relief of Burns survivors by the provision only of rehabilitation, and advisory services as the Trustees shall in their absolute discretion determine.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.