Trustees THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF ST HUGH'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Charity number: 1139717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Elish Angiolini | Chair | 13 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Professor Emma Bond | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rachel Tanner | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julius Grower | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Asifa Majid | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Prior | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Clifford | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Damian Jenkins | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Vilain | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bence Kocsis | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alessandro Abate | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Benoit Kornmann | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rama Cont | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Cousins | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Taylor | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eve Morisi | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Erin Saupe | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Harald Oberhauser | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Antoinne Jerusalem | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Horst Eidenmuller | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID DOYLE | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN PARKIN | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWARD MATTHEW HUSBAND | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWARD MANN | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr TOM SANDERS | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHISTOPHER JOHN BALLENTINE | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ADRIAN MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GEORGE STEPHEN GARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF DAVID MARSHALL FRMETS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH EVA LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NICHOLAS PERKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RUTH BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr TIMOTHY ROOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN DUNCAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLEN LOUTZENHISER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr LUET WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR PETER MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL GILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JAMES MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR THOMAS POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CLIVE WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR PETER MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr TOM KUHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RAFAEL PERERA-SALAZAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOSHUA GETZLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Prof Shelagh Vainker | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.