Accounts and annual returns WORKINGTON AND DISTRICT CIVIC TRUST
Charity number: 1099738
Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 39 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 39 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 405 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 405 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 770 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 770 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1135 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1135 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1500 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1500 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window