Dogfen lywodraethu STORYBOOK DADS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/08/2003 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION OF THEIR LIBERTY AND WHO ARE DETAINED PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PRISONS IN THE UK AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDINGS OF STORIES FOR THEIR CHILDREN IN AN EFFORT TO MAINTAIN AND STRENGTHEN FAMILY LINKS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE DETAINED IN PRISONS IN THE UK AND IRELAND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN AUDIO AND VIDEO PRODUCTION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CHANCES OF REHABILITATION INTO THE COMMUNITY. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF THOSE RELEASED FROM UK PRISONS BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR FURTHER TRAINING IN AUDIO AND VIDEO PRODUCTION THROUGH PAID EMPLOYMENT OR VOLUNTEERING WITH STORYBOOK DADS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.