Trustees Ashden Climate Solutions
Charity number: 1104153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Harrison | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebekah Shirley | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Muigai Kamphuis | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Campanale | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marix Evans | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW REICHER | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Agamemnon Otero | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Susanne Colenbrander | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|||||
SARAH BUTLER SLOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.