Trustees THE CORONERS' COURTS SUPPORT SERVICE
Charity number: 1105899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Blue | Chair | 03 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Lorna Gozzard | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Elizabeth Chudley | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wai Hang Lau | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER PEAKER | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICOLAS GIBBON | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS MAGGIE FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.