Accounts and annual returns ANGELS OF THE NORTH
Charity number: 1109033
Charity reporting is overdue by 1227 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 131 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 131 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 497 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 497 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 862 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 862 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1227 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 13 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window