Trustees EUROPEAN GUIDE DOG FEDERATION
Charity number: 1120553
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ADAMS | Chair | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Serhan Kaleli | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Megahey | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Eilers | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Kovasin | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karina Gregory | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karine Garnier | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Lamb | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Darinka LECNIK-URBANCL | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sean Dilley | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr IOANNA GERTSOU | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.